US HB5550 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AID Act Achieving Independence through Degrees Act
Title
AID Act Achieving Independence through Degrees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition. |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1193 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB1635 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3875 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
SB206 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S448)
SB2081 (Related) 2017-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1049 (Similar To) 2018-09-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1635 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3875 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
SB206 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S448)
SB2081 (Related) 2017-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1049 (Similar To) 2018-09-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5550/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5550/BILLS-115hr5550ih.pdf |