US HB554 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make State Governments More Open, Honest, and Transparent Act of 2017 This bill directs the head of a federal agency that administers any of specified block grant programs to suspend the authority of the state to administer funds under the program if the state does not enact or enforce at least one law that requires disclosure by a state legislator of financial interests, prohibits a legislator from soliciting political party or election campaign contributions, or prohibits the making or soliciting of contributions during a period of contractor performance or negotiations.
Title
Make State Governments More Open, Honest, and Transparent Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Aviation and airports
Child care and development
Child health
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mental health
Political parties and affiliation
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
Women's health
Aviation and airports
Child care and development
Child health
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mental health
Political parties and affiliation
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/554/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr554/BILLS-115hr554ih.pdf |