US HB5504 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require that certain information relating to terrorism investigations be included in the NICS database, and for other purposes.
Title
To require that certain information relating to terrorism investigations be included in the NICS database, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Gwen Graham [D-FL] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2016-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5495 (Related) 2016-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB3058 (Related) 2016-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3058 (Related) 2016-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Retail and wholesale trades
Terrorism
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Retail and wholesale trades
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5504/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5504/BILLS-114hr5504ih.pdf |