US HB5491 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Health Insurance Act of 2018 This bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture to provide loans and grants to assist in the establishment of agricultural association health plans to help bring new health options and lower priced health care coverage to rural Americans.
Title
Rural Health Insurance Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Employee benefits and pensions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Employee benefits and pensions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5491/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5491/BILLS-115hr5491ih.pdf |