US HB5476 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cabin Fee Act of 2014 - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to set an annual fee for the issuance of a special use permit for the use and occupancy of National Forest System land for recreational residence purposes. Requires the Secretary to: (1) complete the current appraisal cycle, including receipt of timely second appraisals, for such residences within one year after enactment of this Act; and (2) assess an interim annual fee for them according to a specified formula. Specifies the annual fee for each of 11 fee tiers based on the value of the lot of which the recreational residence is located, adjusted annually for inflation. Requires the Secretary to report after 10 years on these annual fees in order to ensure that they reflect fair value for the use of System land, and on any recommendations to modify the fee system. Directs the Secretary to establish a transfer fee of $1,200 for the issuance of a new recreational residence permit due to a change in ownership of the recreational residence. Permits the Secretary, beginning 10 years after enactment of this Act, to: (1) retain and expend any fees collected under this Act, without further appropriation; and (2) use them to administer the recreational residence program and other recreation programs carried out on System land. Repeals the Cabin User Fees Fairness Act of 2000, effective on the date the annual permit fees are first assessed under this Act.
Title
Cabin Fee Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-707. |
2014-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1341 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 397.
HB4873 (Related) 2014-06-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
HB4873 (Related) 2014-06-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees