US HB5468 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-14)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1103 USPS Building 1103 in Camp Pendleton, California, as the "Camp Pendleton Medal of Honor Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1103 USPS Building 1103 in Camp Pendleton, California, as the "Camp Pendleton Medal of Honor Post Office".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8005) |
2014-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5468. |
2014-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8004-8005) |
2014-11-17 | House | Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service