US HB5452 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce Unemployment for Veterans of All Ages Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Unemployment for Veterans of All Ages Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2018-04-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2018-04-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2018-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4504 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, House Administration, the Judiciary, Ethics, Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1938 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback