US HB5446 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5446 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5446 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to restrict the immediate sale of seized property by the Secretary of the Treasury to perishable goods. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to limit the authority of the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to immediately sell certain seized property. The IRS may continue to immediately sell seized property that is liable to perish (e.g., food, but not clothing or equipment) after the owner is given an opportunity to pay the appraised value of the property or post a bond to ensure payment. The IRS may no longer immediately sell seized property merely if it is liable to become greatly reduced in price or value or cannot be kept without great expense.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to restrict the immediate sale of seized property by the Secretary of the Treasury to perishable goods.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5446 is laid on the table. |
2018-04-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3366) |
2018-04-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5446. |
2018-04-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3366-3367) |
2018-04-17 | House | Ms. Jenkins (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5444 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR831 (Similar To) 2018-04-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR831 (Similar To) 2018-04-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5446/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5446/BILLS-115hr5446ih.pdf |