US HB5439 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5439 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5439 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for a single point of contact at the Internal Revenue Service for the taxpayers who are victims of tax-related identity theft. (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to provide a single point of contact for any taxpayer whose tax return has been delayed or otherwise adversely affected due to tax-related identity theft. The single point of contact must track the taxpayer's case to completion and coordinate with other IRS employees to resolve case issues as quickly as possible. The single point of contact must consist of a team or subset of specially trained employees who: (1) have the ability to work across functions to resolve the issues involved in the taxpayer's case, and (2) are accountable for handling the case until its resolution.
Title
To provide for a single point of contact at the Internal Revenue Service for the taxpayers who are victims of tax-related identity theft.
Sponsors
Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5439 is laid on the table. |
2018-04-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3370) |
2018-04-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5439. |
2018-04-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3370-3371) |
2018-04-17 | House | Mr. Renacci moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5444 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR831 (Similar To) 2018-04-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7227 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR831 (Similar To) 2018-04-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7227 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Department of the Treasury
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Department of the Treasury
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5439/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5439/BILLS-115hr5439ih.pdf |