US HB5438 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5438 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow officers and employees of the Department of the Treasury to provide to taxpayers information regarding low-income taxpayer clinics. This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow officers and employees of the Department of the Treasury to: (1) advise taxpayers of the availability of, and eligibility requirements for receiving, advice and assistance from low-income taxpayer clinics that receive grants from Treasury; and (2) provide the location and contact information for the clinics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow officers and employees of the Department of the Treasury to provide to taxpayers information regarding low-income taxpayer clinics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5438 is laid on the table.
2018-04-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-04-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3367)
2018-04-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5438.
2018-04-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3367)
2018-04-17HouseMr. Holding moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-04-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-04-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-04-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5444 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR831 (Similar To) 2018-04-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback