US HB5437 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5437 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to establish a program for the issuance of identity protection personal identification numbers. (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Department of the Treasury to establish a program to issue, upon the request of any individual, a number that may be used in connection with a Social Security number (or other identifying information) to assist in verifying the individual's identity. The program must be established within five years of the enactment of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to establish a program for the issuance of identity protection personal identification numbers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5437 is laid on the table.
2018-04-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-04-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3369)
2018-04-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5437.
2018-04-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3369-3370)
2018-04-17HouseMr. Paulsen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-04-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
2018-04-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-04-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-04-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5361 (Related) 2018-03-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5444 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR831 (Similar To) 2018-04-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3186 (Related) 2018-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4844-4845)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback