US HB543 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Choice Act of 2015 Repeals the health insurance and health coverage expansion requirements of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and related requirements of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010. Restores provisions of law amended or repealed by those provisions. Amends the Public Health Service Act to provide that the laws of the state designated by a health insurance issuer (primary state) apply to individual health insurance coverage offered by that issuer in the primary state and in any other state (secondary state), but only if the coverage and issuer comply with the conditions of this Act. Exempts issuers from any secondary state's laws that would prohibit or regulate the operation of the issuer in that state, subject to certain restrictions imposed by that state. Gives sole jurisdiction to the primary state to enforce the primary state's covered laws in the primary state and any secondary state. Requires the Government Accountability Office to study the effect of this Act on specified health insurance issues.
Title
Health Care Choice Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] |
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] |
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB647 (Same As) 2015-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2300 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2653 (Related) 2015-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3682 (Related) 2016-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
SB2519 (Related) 2016-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S740-741)
HB2300 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2653 (Related) 2015-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3682 (Related) 2016-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
SB2519 (Related) 2016-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S740-741)
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/543/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr543/BILLS-114hr543ih.pdf |