US HB5422 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure funding for the National Human Trafficking Hotline, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Victims of Trafficking and Violence Protection Act of 2000 to eliminate the provision that specifies that Department of Health and Human Services national human trafficking hotline grants be funded by amounts made available to the Department of Justice for trafficking victim services grants.
Title
To ensure funding for the National Human Trafficking Hotline, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 0 (Roll no. 588). (text: CR H6329-6330) |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6351-6352) |
2016-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5422. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6329-6332) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-11-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2016-06-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Health programs administration and funding
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding
Crime victims
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Health programs administration and funding
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding