US HB5392 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - Became Public Law No: 114-247. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - Became Public Law No: 114-247. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Veterans Crisis Line Call Should Go Unanswered Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to develop a quality assurance document for carrying out the toll-free Veterans Crisis Line (VCL), which shall: (1) outline performance indicators and objectives to improve the VCL, including at backup call centers; (2) include time frames to meet such indicators and objectives; and (3) be consistent with guidance issued by the Office of Management and Budget. The VA shall develop a plan to ensure that each telephone call, text message, and other communications received by the VCL, including at backup call centers, is answered in a timely manner by a person, consistent with the guidance established by the American Association of Suicidology. The plan shall include guidelines for periodic VCL testing. The VA shall submit the document and plan within 180 days.
Title
No Veterans Crisis Line Call Should Go Unanswered Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-26 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 357 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 357 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 357 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-247. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-11-18 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6421) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 0 (Roll no. 558). (text: CR H5888) |
2016-09-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5893-5894) |
2016-09-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5392. |
2016-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5888-5891) |
2016-09-26 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health care quality
Mental health
Performance measurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health care quality
Mental health
Performance measurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' medical care