US HB539 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 359.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 359.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Disaster Recovery Reform Act of 2018 to require the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to waive certain debts owed to the United States related to covered assistance provided to an individual or household, and for other purposes.
Title
Preventing Disaster Revictimization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 359. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-101. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2767) |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 539. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2767-2768) |
2021-06-15 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-06-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 43. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2021-06-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-61, Part I. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1946 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.