US HB5356 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Security Commission Artificial Intelligence Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Security Commission Artificial Intelligence Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
2018-03-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
2018-03-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
2018-03-20HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-20HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-20HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-20HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-20HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2806 (Related) 2018-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback