US HB5356 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-297.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-297.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 14231 TX-150 in Coldspring, Texas, as the "E. Marie Youngblood Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 14231 TX-150 in Coldspring, Texas, as the "E. Marie Youngblood Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 14231 TX-150 in Coldspring, Texas, as the "E. Marie Youngblood Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-297. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7103) |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 679. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Senate vitiated previous passage. (consideration: CR S6688, S6716) |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6684) |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 679. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5677) |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5356. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5677-5678) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-05-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Texas
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Texas