US HB534 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HAND UP Act Help Americans in Need Develop their Ultimate Potential Act Establishes a framework for the head of a state entity or of a sub-state entity administering two or more qualified federal programs to participate in a demonstration project, approved by the administering Secretary, that supports individuals and families with the goal of moving them towards self-sufficiency, reducing welfare dependence, and increasing work and earnings. Authorizes the administering Secretary to waive program requirements for purposes of the demonstration. Specifies as qualified federal programs: (1) the TANF program under part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) of title IV of the Social Security Act (SSAct), (2) the Block Grants to States for Social Services under SSAct title XX, (3) activities funded under the Workforce Investment Act of 1998 or under the Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act; (4) activities funded under the United States Housing Act of 1937, and (5) the supplemental nutrition assistance program under the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008. Amends the United States Housing Act of 1937 to require an annual public housing agency plan for a public housing agency to contain certain demonstration project application information.
Title
HAND UP Act Help Americans in Need Develop their Ultimate Potential Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] |
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Financial Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Department of Agriculture
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Employment and training programs
Food assistance and relief
Intergovernmental relations
Low- and moderate-income housing
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Department of Agriculture
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Employment and training programs
Food assistance and relief
Intergovernmental relations
Low- and moderate-income housing
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Social welfare
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/534/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr534/BILLS-114hr534ih.pdf |