US HB5331 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Violence Against Immigrant Women Act of 2012 - Amends provisions regarding violence against immigrant women in the following areas: (1) employment of Violence Against Women Act (VAWA) and U-visa (victims of certain crimes) nonimmigrant aliens, (2) self-petitioning, (3) protections for children and family members from traffickers and criminals, (4) recapture of unused U-visas, (5) battered spouse and family member protections, (6) asylum, (7) removal, (8) naturalization, (9) VAWA confidentiality, (10) services for trafficking victims, (11) fiancee/fiance protections and marriage broker regulation, and (12) sexual abuse in custodial settings.
Title
Violence Against Immigrant Women Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] | Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity. |
2012-08-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2012-08-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement. |
2012-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Adoption and foster care
Aging
Assault and harassment offenses
Child safety and welfare
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Detention of persons
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Education programs funding
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government liability
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Judicial review and appeals
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Marriage and family status
Policy sciences
Poverty and welfare assistance
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Research administration and funding
Right of privacy
School administration
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
User charges and fees
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Adoption and foster care
Aging
Assault and harassment offenses
Child safety and welfare
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Detention of persons
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Education programs funding
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government liability
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Judicial review and appeals
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Marriage and family status
Policy sciences
Poverty and welfare assistance
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Research administration and funding
Right of privacy
School administration
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
User charges and fees
Violent crime
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/5331/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr5331/BILLS-112hr5331ih.pdf |