US HB5322 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. Territories Investor Protection Act of 2016 This bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to repeal the exemption from its coverage of investment companies created under the laws of Puerto Rico, the Virgin Islands, or any other U.S. possession.
Title
U.S. Territories Investor Protection Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2016-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-07-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4581) |
2016-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5322. |
2016-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4581-4582) |
2016-07-11 | House | Mr. Hurt (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 521. |
2016-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-673. |
2016-06-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 59 - 0. |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2016-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Caribbean area
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Puerto Rico
Securities
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Caribbean area
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Puerto Rico
Securities
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands