US HB532 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 600 East First Street in Rome, Georgia, as the "Harold L. Murphy Federal Building and United States Courthouse".
Title
To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 600 East First Street in Rome, Georgia, as the "Harold L. Murphy Federal Building and United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2024-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1070-1071) |
2024-03-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-03-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 532. |
2024-03-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1070-1071) |
2024-03-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-03-11 | House | Mr. Molinaro moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-09-18 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 35. |
2023-09-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-200. |
2023-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |