US HB5319 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 795.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 795.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To transfer Coast Guard property in the Town of Jupiter Island, Florida, for inclusion in Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge.
Title
To transfer Coast Guard property in the Town of Jupiter Island, Florida, for inclusion in Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 795. |
2018-11-13 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2018-11-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1016, Part I. |
2018-04-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5245 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
HB5319 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 795.
SB140 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-282.
HB5319 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 795.
SB140 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-282.