US HB5272 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
RESULTS Act of 2018 Reinforcing Evidence-Based Standards Under Law in Treating Substance Abuse Act of 2018 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require applicants to demonstrate that a program or activity is evidence-based when applying for support from the Department of Health and Human Services for a program or activity to prevent or treat a mental health or substance use disorder.
Title
RESULTS Act of 2018 Reinforcing Evidence-Based Standards Under Law in Treating Substance Abuse Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5053) |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5272. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5053-5055) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health