US HB5260 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes and alters several programs and requirements relating to the prices of prescription drugs. For example, the bill establishes and alters several requirements under Medicare and Medicaid, including requiring drug manufacturers to issue rebates to the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services for covered drugs under Medicare that cost $100 or more and for which the average manufacturer price increases faster than inflation; reducing the annual out-of-pocket spending threshold, and eliminating beneficiary cost-sharing above this threshold, under the Medicare prescription drug benefit; and increasing the maximum rebate amount under the Medicaid Drug Rebate Program. The bill also makes changes relating to market exclusivities and manufacturer price concessions for prescription drugs, including authorizing the Federal Trade Commission to initiate proceedings against parties to settlements of patent infringement claims that have anticompetitive effects with respect to drugs or biologics, limiting in certain instances the number of patents that the manufacturer of a biologic can assert in a lawsuit against a company seeking to sell a biosimilar version, and nullifying regulations relating to the treatment of certain Medicare prescription drug benefit rebates from drug manufacturers for purposes of federal anti-kickback laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduced Costs and Continued Cures Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-09-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-09-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2706 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2855 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2873 (Related) 2021-09-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 16.
HB2884 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
HB2891 (Related) 2021-09-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 13.
HB4417 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1428 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 180.
SB1435 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
SB2327 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5237 (Related) 2021-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Appropriations
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Contracts and agency
Department of Health and Human Services
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Inflation and prices
Intellectual property
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Medicaid
Medicare
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback