US HB5250 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Rural Economic Area Partnership Zones Program through fiscal year 2023. This bill amends the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to reauthorize the Department of Agriculture (USDA) Rural Economic Area Partnership Zones Program through FY2023. (The program assists rural communities suffering from out-migration, lack of employment opportunities, and geographic isolation by providing technical assistance, financial assistance, and priority consideration for certain USDA loan and grant programs.)
Title
To reauthorize the Rural Economic Area Partnership Zones Program through fiscal year 2023.
Sponsors
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2018-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Economic development
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Rural conditions and development
Economic development
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5250/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5250/BILLS-115hr5250ih.pdf |