US HB525 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterinary Public Health Amendments Act of 2011 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to revise a public health workforce grant program designed to increase the number of individuals in the public health workforce to include a health professions school or program of veterinary public health. Defines "veterinary public health" to include veterinarians engaged in one or more of the following areas to the extent such areas have an impact on human health: biodefense and emergency preparedness; emerging and reemerging infection diseases; environmental health; ecosystem health pre- and post-harvest food protection; regulatory medicine; diagnostic laboratory medicine; veterinary pathology; biomedical research; the practice of food animal medicine in rural areas; and government practice. Expands the public health workforce loan repayment program to make such veterinarians eligible for the program.
Title
Veterinary Public Health Amendments Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 280 N: 138 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2011-03-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-03-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 280 - 138 (Roll no. 164). (text: CR H1600) |
2011-03-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1602-1603) |
2011-03-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-03-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 525. |
2011-03-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1600-1601) |
2011-03-08 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 10. |
2011-03-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 112-22. |
2011-02-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2011-02-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-02-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2011-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Subjects
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Student aid and college costs
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Student aid and college costs
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases