US HB5233 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-08-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-08-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Passport Act of June 4, 1920, to make certain improvements with respect to expenditure and other authorities, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the Passport Act of June 4, 1920, to make certain improvements with respect to expenditure and other authorities, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] |
Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] |
Sen. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] |
Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Sen. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-08-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2043 (Related) 2023-08-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
SB2043 (Related) 2023-08-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5233/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5233/BILLS-118hr5233ih.pdf |