US HB5226 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regulatory Integrity Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill directs each executive agency to make publicly available on the agency website or in the rule making docket on Regulations.gov a list of pending agency regulatory actions and for each such action: the date the agency began to develop or consider the action, its status, an estimate of the date it will be final and in effect, and a brief description of such action; a list of any duplicative or overlapping regulatory actions issued by the same or any other agency; if a regulatory impact analysis has been conducted, the findings of such analysis, including any data or formula used for purposes of such analysis; and a list of each public communication about the action issued by the agency, including the date of the communication, its intended audience, the method of communication, and a copy of the original communication. Each agency shall publish the information required within 24 hours after such communication is issued and maintain the public availability of such information for at least 5 years after the action is finalized. Any public communication issued by an agency that refers to a pending agency regulatory action: shall specify whether the agency is considering alternatives and accepting comments; shall expressly disclose that the agency is the source of the information to the intended recipients; and may not solicit support for or promote the action, be sent through the private email account of an agency officer or employee, or include statements of aggrandizement for the agency, any federal employee, or the action. An agency that communicated about a pending agency regulatory action during the previous fiscal year shall submit to each congressional committee with jurisdiction over the agency's activities, by January 15 of each year, a report indicating: the number of pending agency regulatory actions the agency issued public communications about during that fiscal year, the average number of public communications issued by the agency for each such action, and the five pending actions with the highest number of public communications issued by the agency in that fiscal year and a copy of each such communication. The report shall be made publicly available on the agency's website.
Title
Regulatory Integrity Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 238 N: 171 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 241 N: 154 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 185 N: 238 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - On Passage (Y: 250 N: 171 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Passage (Y: 250 N: 171 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 241 N: 154 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 185 N: 238 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - On Passage (Y: 250 N: 171 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Passage (Y: 250 N: 171 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-14 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 250 - 171 (Roll no. 510). |
2016-09-14 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 185 - 238 (Roll no. 509). |
2016-09-14 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H5477) |
2016-09-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kildee motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to combat a public health crisis including the Zika virus, opioid abuse, and lead poisoning. |
2016-09-14 | House | Mr. Kildee moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Oversight and Government. (consideration: CR H5476-5478; text: CR H5477) |
2016-09-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5476) |
2016-09-14 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 5226. |
2016-09-14 | House | H.Amdt.1415 On agreeing to the Boustany amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 241 - 154 (Roll no. 508). |
2016-09-14 | House | H.Amdt.1417 On agreeing to the McKinley amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2016-09-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 863, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McKinley amendment No. 3. |
2016-09-14 | House | H.Amdt.1417 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. McKinley. |
2016-09-14 | House | H.Amdt.1416 On agreeing to the Fleming amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2016-09-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 863, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Fleming amendment No. 2. |
2016-09-14 | House | H.Amdt.1416 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Fleming. |
2016-09-14 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Boustany amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Clay demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced. |
2016-09-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 863, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Boustany amendment No. 1. |
2016-09-14 | House | H.Amdt.1415 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Boustany. |
2016-09-14 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 5226. |
2016-09-14 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Keith J. Rothfus to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2016-09-14 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 863 and Rule XVIII. |
2016-09-14 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. Rule provides for one hour of debate on both H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. |
2016-09-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 863. (consideration: CR H5470-5479; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H5473-5474) |
2016-09-14 | House | Rule H. Res. 863 passed House. |
2016-09-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 863 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. Rule provides for one hour of debate on both H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. |
2016-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 565. |
2016-09-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-729. |
2016-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics