US HB5226 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charlotte's Web Medical Hemp Act of 2014 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to exclude therapeutic hemp and cannabidiol: (1) from the definition of "marihuana," and (2) from treatment as a controlled substance under such Act. Defines: (1) "therapeutic hemp" to mean the plant Cannabis sativa L. and any part of such plant with a delta-9 tetrahydrocannabinol concentration of not more than 0.3 percent on a dry weight basis; and (2) "cannabidiol" to mean the substance cannabidiol, as derived from therapeutic hemp. Exempts therapeutic hemp or cannabidiol from the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act. Declares that nothing in this Act shall restrict any activities related to the use, production, or distribution of marihuana in a state in which such activities are legal under state law.
Title
Charlotte's Web Medical Hemp Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Joe Garcia [D-FL] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] |
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Alan Nunnelee [R-MS] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-08-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-07-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-07-28 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-07-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB525 (Related) 2013-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Horticulture and plants
State and local government operations
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Horticulture and plants
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5226/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5226/BILLS-113hr5226ih.pdf |