US HB5225 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the National Instant Criminal Background Check System Act of 2018
Title
Strengthening the National Instant Criminal Background Check System Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR40 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-8. (TXT | PDF)
SJR14 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S494-497)
SJR14 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S494-497)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Disability assistance
Firearms and explosives
Mental health
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social Security Administration
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Disability assistance
Firearms and explosives
Mental health
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social Security Administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5225/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5225/BILLS-115hr5225ih.pdf |