US HB5217 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WOW Act Water Optimization for the West Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WOW Act Water Optimization for the West Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2019-12-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-11-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-11-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2019-11-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-11-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-11-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-11-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-11-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB278 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HB548 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB579 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB1600 (Related) 2019-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB1621 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback