US HB521 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the conveyance of certain property to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation located in Bethel, Alaska. (Sec. 1) Directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation in Bethel, Alaska, all U.S. interest in specified property for use in connection with health and social services programs. Declares that such conveyance shall not: (1) require any consideration from or impose any obligation, term, or condition on the Corporation; or (2) allow for any U.S. reversionary interest in the property. (Sec. 3) Shields the Corporation from liability for any soil, surface water, groundwater, or other contamination resulting from the disposal, release, or presence of environmental contamination on any of the property on or before it is conveyed to the Corporation. Accords to HHS any easement or access to the conveyed property as may be necessary to satisfy any retained obligations and liability. Requires HHS to comply with Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 requirements in carrying out such conveyance.
Title
To provide for the conveyance of certain property to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation located in Bethel, Alaska.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163. |
2015-07-22 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2015-07-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-217, Part I. |
2015-06-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-06-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2015-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB230 (Same As) 2015-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 114-56. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Public lands and natural resources
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Public lands and natural resources