US HB5204 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Lands Recreation Enhancement Modernization Act of 2014 - Amends the Federal Lands Recreation Enhancement Act to extend the authority for the collection and expenditure of recreation fees on federal lands through 2020. Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to: charge day use fees for lands and waters at a National Conservation Area, a National Volcanic Monument, a destination visitor or interpretive center, and sites of concentrated public use that meet specified criteria; charge transportation fees at National Park Service units; charge amenity fees for the use of facilities or services on federal lands; charge fees for special recreation permits issued to recreation service providers and for individual and group use of federal facilities, lands, and waters; and issue recreation concession permits to provide facilities and services on lands and waters managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM). Prohibits the Secretary from charging recreation fees for any site, area, or activity except as authorized by statute. Requires the Secretary to determine a nationally consistent fee policy and rate structure for specified fees authorized by this Act. Establishes a stewardship program for recreation service providers involving credit against permit fees in exchange for maintenance and resource protection work performed. Requires congressional approval of certain new or increased fees. Increases the portion of fee revenue available for expenditure at the collection site from 80% to 90%. Limits fee revenues that the Secretary may use for overhead, administrative, and collection costs.
Title
Federal Lands Recreation Enhancement Modernization Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537. |
2014-12-22 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-706, Part I. |
2014-08-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-25 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2014-07-25 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Forests, forestry, trees
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Military personnel and dependents
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation costs
User charges and fees
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Forests, forestry, trees
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Military personnel and dependents
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation costs
User charges and fees
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats