US HB5197 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ALTO Act Alternatives to Opioids in the Emergency Department Act This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services to carry out a three-year demonstration program awarding grants to hospitals and emergency departments to develop, implement, enhance, or study alternative pain management protocols and treatments that promote limited use of opioids in emergency departments.
Title
ALTO Act Alternatives to Opioids in the Emergency Department Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5067-5068) |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5197. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5067-5069) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2516 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding