US HB5196 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To expedite application for payment of rental arrearages by landlords and mandate tenant access to financial assistance, and for other purposes.
Title
Expediting Assistance to Renters and Landlords Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22. |
2021-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-09-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-09-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5269 (Related) 2021-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5196/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5196/BILLS-117hr5196ih.pdf |