US HB5174 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide for a State-sponsored nonimmigrant pilot program, and for other purposes.
Title
State Sponsored Visa Pilot Program Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Agriculture, Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Agriculture, Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Agriculture, Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Agriculture, Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Agriculture, Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Agriculture, Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Business investment and capital
Economic development
Employment taxes
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Business investment and capital
Economic development
Employment taxes
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5174/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5174/BILLS-116hr5174ih.pdf |