US HB5166 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 97-39-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
WINGMAN Act Working to Integrate Networks Guaranteeing Member Access Now Act This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide an accredited, permanent congressional employee with read-only remote access to the electronic Veterans Benefits Administration (VBA) claims records system of a represented veteran, regardless of whether the employee is acting under a power of attorney executed by the veteran. The VA shall ensure that access does not allow the employee to modify system data. An employee must complete the VA certification process required of agents or attorneys in order to have system access. Each Member of Congress who elects to have an employee participate in the system shall bear the certification cost, which shall be paid from the Member's representational allowance. Information access by an employee shall be deemed: (1) a covered disclosure requiring prior consent, with specified exceptions; and (2) a permitted disclosure relating to the privacy of individually identifiable health information. The VA may not recognize an employee for purposes of preparation, presentation, and prosecution of VA claims by reason of such system access. "Accredited, permanent congressional employee" means an employee of a Member of Congress who assists constituents with issues regarding federal departments or agencies. "Electronic VBA claims records system" means the VA system that provides claim status information, including information about medical records, compensation and pension exams records, rating decisions, a statement of the case and a supplementary statement of the case, a notice of disagreement, and Form-9.
Title
WINGMAN Act Working to Integrate Networks Guaranteeing Member Access Now Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-29 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6338-6339) |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5166. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6338-6340) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3081 (Related) 2016-06-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional officers and employees
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Members of Congress
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Congressional officers and employees
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Members of Congress
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' pensions and compensation