US HB5151 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize a grant program improving treatment for pregnant and postpartum women.
Title
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize a grant program improving treatment for pregnant and postpartum women.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2456 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Terrorism. Hearings held.
HB5311 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB2710 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2323)
HB5311 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB2710 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2323)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5151/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5151/BILLS-115hr5151ih.pdf |