US HB512 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Election Integrity Act of 2010 - Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to make it unlawful for a chief state election administration official to take active part in political management or in a political campaign with respect to any election for federal office over which the official has supervisory authority. Waives application of this Act if the chief state election administration official himself or herself, or an immediate family member, is a candidate. States that the budgetary effects of this Act, for compliance with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act, provided that such statement has been submitted before the vote on passage.
Title
Federal Election Integrity Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-15 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. | |
2010-09-29 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-09-29 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 296 - 129 (Roll no. 563). (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7145-7146) | |
2010-09-29 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7372) | |
2010-09-28 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-09-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 512. | |
2010-09-28 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7145-7148) | |
2010-09-28 | Mrs. Davis (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-12-08 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215. | |
2009-12-08 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-363. | |
2009-06-10 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2009-06-10 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. | |
2009-01-14 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E84) |
Subjects
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations