US HB5105 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a Chief Veterinary Officer, who shall: (1) head the division of DHS with primary responsibility for veterinary issues, food defense, and agriculture security; and (2) have primary responsibility within DHS for responsibilities relating to veterinary medicine and veterinary public health. Requires that such Officer: (1) be a veterinarian who possesses a demonstrated ability in and knowledge of veterinary public health and emergency preparedness; (2) be appointed by the DHS Secretary; and (3) report directly to the Chief Medical Officer (or to the Assistant Secretary for Health Affairs if the Assistant Secretary is not serving as Chief Medical Officer). Directs: (1) such Officer to report to Congress on the state of DHS's working animals during each fiscal year and include a description of any animal initiative or program conducted during such fiscal year; and (2) the Secretary to report to the appropriate congressional committees at least 180 days before carrying out any reorganization within DHS that would affect any responsibility of the Chief Veterinary Officer.
Title
To establish a Chief Veterinary Officer in the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Carney [D-PA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Mary Kilroy [D-OH] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-22 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 412. | |
2010-12-22 | Committee on Agriculture discharged. | |
2010-12-21 | House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 22, 2010. | |
2010-12-17 | House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 21, 2010. | |
2010-12-10 | House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 17, 2010. | |
2010-11-30 | House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 10, 2010. | |
2010-11-30 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 111-668, Part I. | |
2010-06-23 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-06-23 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-06-23 | Subcommittee on Emerging Threats, Cybersecurity, and Science and Technology Discharged. | |
2010-06-18 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture and Organic Agriculture. | |
2010-04-28 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats, Cybersecurity, and Science and Technology. | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to House Agriculture | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to House Homeland Security | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3263 (Related) 2010-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2709-2710)
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Medical research
Research and development
Terrorism
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Medical research
Research and development
Terrorism
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases