US HB5087 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To remove the Federal claim to navigational servitude for a tract of land developed due to dredging disposal from a harbor project in Valdez, Alaska, and for other purposes. This bill removes the portion of the project for navigation, Valdez, Alaska, identified as Tract G, Harbor Subdivision, from navigational servitude. The federal government may enter that tract to carry out any required operation and maintenance of the general navigation features of such project.
Title
To remove the Federal claim to navigational servitude for a tract of land developed due to dredging disposal from a harbor project in Valdez, Alaska, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 2848 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 4979 to S. 2848 (Water Resources Development Act of 2016) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 2848 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 4979 to S. 2848 (Water Resources Development Act of 2016) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.
HB5303 (Related) 2016-09-29 - Received in the Senate.
HB5303 (Related) 2016-09-29 - Received in the Senate.