US HB5086 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study on feasibility of designating as a national historic trail the Chief Standing Bear Trail extending approximately 550 miles from Ponca City, Oklahoma, through Omaha, Nebraska, which follows the route taken by Chief Standing Bear and the Ponca people during federal Indian removal, and approximately 550 miles from Ponca City through Omaha to Niobrara, Nebraska, which follows the return route taken by Chief Standing Bear and the Ponca people.
Title
To amend the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study on the feasibility of designating the Chief Standing Bear National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2014-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8881) |
2014-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5086. |
2014-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8881-8882) |
2014-12-09 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-12-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 489. |
2014-12-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-651. |
2014-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-11-19 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2745 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Nebraska
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Nebraska
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history