US HB5075 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ashanti Alert Act of 2018 This bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to establish a national communications network—the Ashanti Alert communications network—to support regional and local search efforts for missing adults. The Ashanti Alert communications network must operate in coordination with the AMBER Alert communications network (i.e., the communications network that supports search efforts for abducted children).
Title
Ashanti Alert Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Taylor [R-VA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment RC# 450 (Y: 386 N: 2 NV: 44 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 2 (Roll no. 450). (consideration: CR H10531-10532; text: CR H10393-10395) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5075. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Mr. Collins (GA) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10393-10395) |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.4072 Amendment SA 4072 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.4072 Amendment SA 4072 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Warner. (consideration: CR S7372) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7372) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8817-8818) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5075. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8817-8820) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3714 (Related) 2018-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.