US HB5070 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grain Inspection Improvement Act This bill restores certain exceptions to the United States Grain Standards Act that permit certain grain handling facilities to have their grain inspected by grain inspection agencies outside of the official service boundary. The bill applies to grain handling facilities that were granted exceptions by the Department of Agriculture (USDA) that were revoked by USDA on or before April 14, 2017.
Title
Grain Inspection Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agriculture and food
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Grain
Agriculture and food
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Grain
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5070/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5070/BILLS-115hr5070ih.pdf |