US HB506 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing Crimes Against Veterans Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to declare that any person who knowingly engages in any scheme or artifice to defraud an individual of veterans' benefits, or in connection with obtaining veteran's benefits for that individual, shall be fined, imprisoned not more than five years, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing Crimes Against Veterans Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2018-03-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1570-1571)
2018-03-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 506.
2018-03-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1570-1573)
2018-03-14HouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-03-14HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456.
2018-03-14HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-599.
2018-01-10HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-01-10HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-01-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB150 (Same As) 2017-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback