US HB5053 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts juvenile prisoners (i.e., inmates who are under 22 years of age) from various requirements of the inmate grievance procedure, including the requirement to exhaust administrative remedies before filing a federal lawsuit regarding the condition of their confinement.
Title
Justice for Juveniles Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4570) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5053. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4570-4571) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Scanlon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-09-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 415. |
2020-09-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-515. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-08 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-11-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Legal fees and court costs
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Legal fees and court costs