US HB5048 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nutrient Management Technical Service Provider Certification Act of 2018 This bill amends the Food Security Act of 1985 to provide alternative certification methods for third-party technical service providers (TSPs). (TSPs provide technical expertise to agricultural producers on behalf of the Department of Agriculture [USDA] Natural Resource Conservation Service to assist in planning and implementing conservation measures.) USDA must approve certain professional certifications that meet or exceed national criteria and were established by: the USDA, an agriculture-related retailer, a farmer cooperative, the American Society of Agronomy, or the National Alliance of Independent Crop Consultants. A qualified certification includes a certifications as: a Certified Crop Advisor by the American Society for Agronomy, a Certified Professional Agronomist by the American Society for Agronomy, and a Comprehensive Nutrient Management Plan Specialist by USDA.
Title
Nutrient Management Technical Service Provider Certification Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5048/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5048/BILLS-115hr5048ih.pdf |