US HB5041 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Safe Disposal of Unused Medication Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to allow a hospice employee to handle lawfully dispensed controlled substances of a deceased hospice patient to assist with disposal of the controlled substances, so long as such disposal occurs onsite in accordance with applicable law.
Title
Safe Disposal of Unused Medication Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 259 (Y: 398 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-06-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5043) |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 259). |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5075-5076) |
2018-06-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5041. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5043-5045) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2661 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB2659 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB2659 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Prescription drugs
Solid waste and recycling
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Prescription drugs
Solid waste and recycling