US HB5037 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-203. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-203. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3703 North Main Street in Farmville, North Carolina, as the "Walter B. Jones, Jr. Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3703 North Main Street in Farmville, North Carolina, as the "Walter B. Jones, Jr. Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-203. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7081) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 451. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H830) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5037. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H830-831) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Lawrence moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-11-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3260 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
North Carolina
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
North Carolina
Postal service