US HB5036 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Financial Technology Protection Act This bill provides for the investigation of new financial technologies (e.g., digital currencies) and their use in terrorism and other illicit activities. (Sec. 3) The bill establishes the Independent Financial Technology Task Force, which must research terrorist and illicit use of new financial technologies and issue an annual report. (Sec. 4) The bill directs the Department of the Treasury to provide a reward for a person who provides information leading to the conviction of an individual involved with terrorist use of digital currencies. (Sec. 5) The bill establishes the FinTech Leadership in Innovation Program to support the development of tools and programs to detect terrorist and illicit use of digital currencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Technology Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2018-09-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9060-9061)
2018-09-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5036.
2018-09-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9060-9062)
2018-09-26HouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 769.
2018-09-26HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-984.
2018-07-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0.
2018-07-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4752 (Related) 2018-01-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5227 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback